Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 279 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5679 Week
» 23731 Month
» 256651 Year
» 1922027 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 152 on 16/09/1937
British Railways 40152 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 16/09/1937
Withdrawal Mon 08/01/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Arnott Young (Troon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/09/1937
27C   Hamilton (West) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
68B   Dumfries 4w/e 04/06/1960
     Withdrawn on 08/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 04/06/1960
WDN   on 08/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos 40152, 40638, 661, 1141, 42164, 42905, 4329, 45086, 54492, 55201/25/65, 6314/76, 57264, 57353, 17359, 57625. Ex-L.N.E.R. locomotives are now being cut up here and on 10/11 Nos. 2214, 2458/81 were noted here. SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/09/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 152
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40152    
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
08/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40152    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev