Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 153 on 22/09/1937
British Railways 40153 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 22/09/1937
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/09/1937
27C   Hamilton (West) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D   Dawsholm w/e 21/01/1950
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Hamilton (West) m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm w/e 21/01/1950
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/09/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 153
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40153    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40153    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev