Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 32 Online
» 807 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1881 Week
» 27242 Month
» 260162 Year
» 1925538 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 155 m/e 10/1937
British Railways 40155 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 10/1937
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
20E   Manningham 4w/e 12/07/1952
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 21/09/1957
56F   Low Moor 4w/e 19/10/1957
56B   Ardsley 4w/e 11/10/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 28/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   on 01/05/1961
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 155
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40155    
10/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40155    

prev prev