|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/06/1961 | Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) | Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 155 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 40155 | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (20E) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
19/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
11/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
28/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 40155 |