Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 785 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1859 Week
» 27220 Month
» 260140 Year
» 1925516 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 156 on 06/10/1937
British Railways 40156 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/10/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 24 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/10/1937
5F   Uttoxeter on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5F   Uttoxeter 4w/e 04/11/1950
2C   Warwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
1A   Willesden 4w/e 11/08/1956
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 01/12/1956
1A   Willesden 4w/e 23/03/1957
8B   Warrington Dallam 8w/e 05/10/1957
16C   Mansfield w/e 17/10/1959
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5F Uttoxeter 5w/e 02/03/1946
LOAN WRX Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 28/01/1950
EXLOAN 5F Uttoxeter w/e 14/10/1950
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 14/04/1951
EXLOAN 5F Uttoxeter w/e 12/05/1951
LOAN 2C Warwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/07/1956
LOAN 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/12/1956
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/10/1957
LOAN 16C Mansfield 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 156
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40156    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40156    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev