Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 36 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4951 Week
» 16188 Month
» 249108 Year
» 1914484 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 157 on 09/10/1937
British Railways 40157 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 09/10/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Tue 09/04/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/10/1937
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 09/07/1949
5D   Stoke w/e 23/07/1949
1A   Willesden 4w/e 11/08/1956
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 06/10/1956
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 09/08/1958
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1958
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/07/1960
1A   Willesden w/e 05/08/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 23/07/1949
LOAN 2C Warwick 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/03/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor MPD (Yard by paint shop) In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. SLS/196304
11/04/1963 Derby Works (Yard by paint shop) Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. SLS/196304
27/04/1963 Birmingham Excursions (Yard by paint shop) On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 157
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40157    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40157    
09/04/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev