Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 316 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5716 Week
» 23768 Month
» 256688 Year
» 1922064 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 159 on 21/10/1937
British Railways 40159 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 21/10/1937
Withdrawal During 12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/10/1937
28A   Motherwell on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
63A   Perth South 4w/e 04/11/1950
63A   Perth South m/e 30/11/1950
66C   Hamilton (West) 4w/e 04/11/1951
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 22/01/1955
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 06/07/1957
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 12/04/1958
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 28A Motherwell m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 63A Perth South m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 04/11/1951
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 22/01/1955
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 22/03/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1950 Kilmarnock Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40159, 40688/9, 41092, 41109/28/55, 44330, 45174, 55269, 55353/9, 57613. SLS/195010
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 159
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40159    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
04/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40159    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev