Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 290 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5690 Week
» 23742 Month
» 256662 Year
» 1922038 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 161 on 04/11/1937
British Railways 40161 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Wed 04/11/1937
Withdrawal Wed 28/12/1960 (At Derby Works)
Withdrawal Notes At Derby Works
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 19/01/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/11/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town w/e 03/01/1948
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/07/1960
82G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 03/01/1948
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 86K Tredegar 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 86K Tredegar 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 86K Tredegar 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   m/e 31/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/06/1959 Tredegar MPD The Barry Island Sunday excursions, for so long worked by ex-L.N.W. 0-8-0s from this shed are now worked by 66XX tanks. On shed at Tredegar, 21st June were-3700 (86K), 5727, 5768 (86B), 6439 (86A), 6600, 9662, 40098 (86K), 40161 (stored), 40171 (86K), 41201/4. SLS/195907
22/08/1959 Tredegar MPD (in store at Newport Pill) Following the allocation of 3712, 7736/87, 8711 an 9662 (w.e. 22/8) the former LMS engines are now in store at Newport Pill viz. 40098/161/71, 41201/4. 40091/145, formerly stored at Pontypool Road, have been returned to the LMR and are at Blackpool and Southport. SLS/195910
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/11/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 161
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
03/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40161    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
28/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 40161    
19/01/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev