Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 162 on 10/11/1937
British Railways 40162 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/11/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/11/1937
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20H   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 15/05/1948
20H   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 28/05/1949
20G   Hellifield w/e 01/10/1949
24D   Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21B Bournville w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 20H Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 15/05/1948
LOAN 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 15/01/1949
EXLOAN 20G Hellifield w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 20H Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 20G Hellifield w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 162
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
15/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40162    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H)    
01/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hellifield (20G)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40162    
01/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev