Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 164 on 20/11/1937
British Railways 40164 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/11/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 10/11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/11/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
22A   Bristol Barrow Road w/e 18/02/1950
21A   Saltley 4w/e 14/08/1954
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 11/09/1954
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 09/12/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/09/1954
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 04/09/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/11/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 164
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40164    
18/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40164    
10/11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev