Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 165 on 25/11/1937
British Railways 40165 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 25/11/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/11/1937
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15D   Bedford w/e 31/01/1948
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 10/01/1959
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15D Bedford w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 165
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
31/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40165    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40165    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev