Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 291 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5691 Week
» 23743 Month
» 256663 Year
» 1922039 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 166 m/e 12/1937
British Railways 40166 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 12/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 03/12/1955
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 21/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 28/02/1959
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 166
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40166    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40166    
01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev