Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 842 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1916 Week
» 27277 Month
» 260197 Year
» 1925573 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 167 on 07/12/1937
British Railways 40167 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 07/12/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/12/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 10/01/1959
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 31/01/1959
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1961 Leicester GC V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 167
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40167    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40167    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev