Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 861 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1935 Week
» 27296 Month
» 260216 Year
» 1925592 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 169 on 16/12/1937
British Railways 40169 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 16/12/1937
Withdrawal Fri 23/10/1959
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/12/1937
20C   Royston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 25/02/1950
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 21/09/1957
56B   Ardsley 4w/e 11/10/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 28/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 23/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 23/11/1946
LOAN 16A Nottingham w/e 08/03/1947
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 29/03/1947
ALLOC 20C Royston w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   on 23/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 169
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40169    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
23/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40169    
03/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev