Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 247 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5647 Week
» 23699 Month
» 256619 Year
» 1921995 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 171 on 24/12/1937
British Railways 40171 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 24/12/1937
Withdrawal Sat 20/05/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 24/12/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1951
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/07/1960
82G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 08/10/1960
6A   Chester (MR) on 23/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 20/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 28/06/1947
LOAN 14B Kentish Town w/e 29/11/1947
EXLOAN 21A Saltley w/e 31/01/1948
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 08/12/1951
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 20/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/06/1959 Tredegar MPD The Barry Island Sunday excursions, for so long worked by ex-L.N.W. 0-8-0s from this shed are now worked by 66XX tanks. On shed at Tredegar, 21st June were-3700 (86K), 5727, 5768 (86B), 6439 (86A), 6600, 9662, 40098 (86K), 40161 (stored), 40171 (86K), 41201/4. SLS/195907
22/08/1959 Tredegar MPD (in store at Newport Pill) Following the allocation of 3712, 7736/87, 8711 an 9662 (w.e. 22/8) the former LMS engines are now in store at Newport Pill viz. 40098/161/71, 41201/4. 40091/145, formerly stored at Pontypool Road, have been returned to the LMR and are at Blackpool and Southport. SLS/195910
03/06/1961 Chester MPD As reported elsewhere, the GW shed has been converted to a diesel depot; the LNW shed contains the recently transferred 2-6-2Ts 40085/6/98/110/26/171/205, all stored. SLS/196107
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 171
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40171    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
23/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40171    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev