Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 172 m/e 12/1937
British Railways 40172 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 12/1937
Withdrawal Sat 21/11/1959
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   w/e 21/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 172
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40172    
10/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
21/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40172    
05/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev