Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 265 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5665 Week
» 23717 Month
» 256637 Year
» 1922013 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 173 on 05/01/1938
British Railways 40173 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/01/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/01/1938
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 15/01/1949
23C   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 01/09/1951
23C   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 08/09/1951
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
3A   Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
6H   Bangor w/e 06/01/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland w/e 15/01/1949
ALLOC 23C Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 27/01/1962
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 173
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40173    
15/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (23C)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (23C)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40173    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev