Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 299 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5699 Week
» 23751 Month
» 256671 Year
» 1922047 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 174 on 08/01/1938
British Railways 40174 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/01/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/06/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/01/1938
22A   Bristol Barrow Road on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 11/09/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 09/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 04/09/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   w/e 09/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 174
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40174    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
09/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40174    
12/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev