Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 281 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5681 Week
» 23733 Month
» 256653 Year
» 1922029 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 175 on 17/03/1938
British Railways 40175 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 17/03/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/03/1938
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16D   Mansfield 4w/e 03/10/1953
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16D Mansfield 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/03/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 175
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40175    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40175    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev