Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 269 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5669 Week
» 23721 Month
» 256641 Year
» 1922017 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 177 m/e 04/1938
British Railways 40177 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 04/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1938
31E   Dawsholm on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 177
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dawsholm (31E)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40177    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40177    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev