Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 311 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5711 Week
» 23763 Month
» 256683 Year
» 1922059 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 178 on 08/04/1938
British Railways 40178 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/04/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/04/1938
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20E   Manningham 4w/e 09/08/1952
27C   Southport w/e 07/02/1959
55F   Manningham w/e 14/02/1959
     To Horwich Works w/e 14/02/1959
27C   Southport w/e 28/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 09/08/1952
LOAN HorwichWorks   4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 178
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40178    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Horwich Works (99H)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (55F)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40178    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev