Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 138 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15750 Week
» 114395 Month
» 317059 Year
» 3343912 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
179 |
on |
14/04/1938 |
British Railways |
40179 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Tue 14/04/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/02/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Thu 08/03/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
14/04/1938 |
21B |
|
Bournville |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20D |
|
Normanton |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/04/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 179 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40179 |
|
|
27/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40179 |
|
|
08/03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|