Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 253 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5653 Week
» 23705 Month
» 256625 Year
» 1922001 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 179 on 14/04/1938
British Railways 40179 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Tue 14/04/1938
Withdrawal Tue 27/02/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 08/03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/04/1938
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20D   Normanton w/e 27/03/1948
     Withdrawn on 27/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20D Normanton w/e 27/03/1948
WDN   on 27/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 179
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
27/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40179    
27/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40179    
08/03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev