Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 854 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1928 Week
» 27289 Month
» 260209 Year
» 1925585 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 181 on 28/04/1938
British Railways 40181 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 28/04/1938
Withdrawal Fri 30/03/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/04/1938
20C   Royston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
55E   Normanton w/e 17/02/1962
     Withdrawn on 30/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC 16A Nottingham w/e 16/11/1946
ALLOC 55E Normanton 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   on 30/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 181
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40181    
17/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
30/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40181    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev