Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 237 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5637 Week
» 23689 Month
» 256609 Year
» 1921985 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 182 on 05/05/1938
British Railways 40182 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/05/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/05/1938
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 01/12/1951
22A   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 26/02/1955
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 23/04/1955
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 10/01/1959
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 21/05/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 01/12/1951
LOAN 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 28/05/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/05/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 182
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40182    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40182    
04/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev