Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 885 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1959 Week
» 27320 Month
» 260240 Year
» 1925616 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 183 on 12/05/1938
British Railways 40183 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 12/05/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/05/1938
20G   Hellifield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19B   Sheffield Millhouses 3w/e 14/01/1950
24D   Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 10/10/1959
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 14/01/1950
EXLOAN 23B Aintree w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/05/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 183
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40183    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40183    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev