Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 305 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5705 Week
» 23757 Month
» 256677 Year
» 1922053 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 184 on 20/05/1938
British Railways 40184 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/05/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/05/1938
20G   Hellifield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16C   Mansfield 4w/e 25/02/1956
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 20G Hellifield w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/05/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 184
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40184    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40184    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev