Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 277 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5677 Week
» 23729 Month
» 256649 Year
» 1922025 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 186 on 21/10/1937
British Railways 40186 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 21/10/1937
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/10/1937
31E   Dawsholm on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 06/07/1957
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 12/04/1958
66C   Hamilton (West) 4w/e 24/03/1962
66B   Motherwell 4w/e 24/11/1962
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 10/11/1962
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40186, 590, 617/27, 41175, 1184, 2195, 2694, 2746, 42809, 2831, 4794, 44960/92, 45007/09/87, 45123/24/38, 45389, 45452/69, 45471/72/82/86/92, 46221, 14472, 15140, 15213, 16243/59, 56261, 16306/53/55, 17246, 17339/64, 57556, 17602/26/40/68. St. Rollox have now started using the B.R. crest, but as yet none of the ex-C.R. locomotives has received one. Two of the diesel railcars are laid up at St. Rollox, and the third at Hamilton. It is rumoured that one is to be broken up SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 186
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dawsholm (31E)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40186    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40186    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev