Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4947 Week
» 16184 Month
» 249104 Year
» 1914480 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 187 on 26/10/1937
British Railways 40187 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 26/10/1937
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/10/1937
31E   Dawsholm on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66C   Hamilton (West) 4w/e 24/03/1962
66B   Motherwell 4w/e 22/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
31/03/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 40151/87, 40610, 40902, 42165, 42211, 42915, 15350, 17280, 57457, 57594, 17655. SLS/195005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 187
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dawsholm (31E)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40187    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40187    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev