Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 314 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5714 Week
» 23766 Month
» 256686 Year
» 1922062 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 188 on 29/10/1937
British Railways 40188 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 29/10/1937
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/10/1937
31E   Dawsholm on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40188, 41099. 41133. 42172. 42417, 42834. 4323. 57565/69. SLS/195004
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 188
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dawsholm (31E)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40188    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40188    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev