Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 191 on 01/12/1937
British Railways 40191 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 01/12/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/12/1937
24C   Lostock Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 31/07/1948
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/09/1961
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 25/11/1961
27C   Southport w/e 02/12/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 22/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 191
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40191    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
22/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40191    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev