Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 276 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5676 Week
» 23728 Month
» 256648 Year
» 1922024 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 192 on 09/12/1937
British Railways 40192 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 09/12/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/12/1961
Service Life 24 yrs , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/12/1937
24C   Lostock Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 31/07/1948
24A   Accrington w/e 29/11/1958
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 07/02/1959
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/07/1948
LOAN 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 5w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   w/e 23/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 192
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40192    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
23/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40192    
10/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev