Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 822 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1896 Week
» 27257 Month
» 260177 Year
» 1925553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 193 on 17/12/1937
British Railways 40193 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 17/12/1937
Withdrawal Sat 25/08/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/12/1937
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 18/06/1949
20A   Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 06/11/1954
55D   Royston w/e 14/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 25/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/06/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 55D Royston 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 23/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 193
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
18/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40193    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
25/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40193    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev