Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 320 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5720 Week
» 23772 Month
» 256692 Year
» 1922068 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 194 on 20/12/1937
British Railways 40194 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 20/12/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/12/1937
24C   Lostock Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 31/07/1948
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1956
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 194
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40194    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40194    
01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev