Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1228 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19031 Week
» 72047 Month
» 191574 Year
» 3218427 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
195 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
British Railways |
40195 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/11/1961 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 195 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40195 |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
23/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40195 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|