Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 36 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4951 Week
» 16188 Month
» 249108 Year
» 1914484 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 196 on 03/01/1938
British Railways 40196 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 03/01/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 09/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 03/01/1938
25G   Farnley Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 31/12/1949
23C   Southport 3w/e 14/01/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/12/1949
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 196
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40196    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40196    
09/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev