Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 740 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1814 Week
» 27175 Month
» 260095 Year
» 1925471 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 197 on 06/01/1938
British Railways 40197 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 06/01/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 13/10/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/01/1938
25G   Farnley Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport 3w/e 14/01/1950
23C   Southport w/e 21/01/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 29/03/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 21/01/1950
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 197
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40197    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40197    
13/10/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev