Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1100 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18903 Week
» 71919 Month
» 191446 Year
» 3218299 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
198 |
on |
10/01/1938 |
British Railways |
40198 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/01/1938 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/07/1962 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
10/01/1938 |
24C |
|
Lostock Hall |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23C |
|
Southport |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
23C |
Southport |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/01/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 198 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40198 |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40198 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|