Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 859 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1933 Week
» 27294 Month
» 260214 Year
» 1925590 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 199 on 24/01/1938
British Railways 40199 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 24/01/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 24/01/1938
24C   Lostock Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 31/07/1948
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 11/10/1947
LOAN 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 05/06/1948
EXLOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 24/07/1948
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/07/1948
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 199
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40199    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40199    
01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev