Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 761 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1835 Week
» 27196 Month
» 260116 Year
» 1925492 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 200 on 27/01/1938
British Railways 40200 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 27/01/1938
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/01/1938
28A   Motherwell on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
63A   Perth South 4w/e 04/11/1950
63A   Perth South m/e 30/11/1950
66B   Motherwell 4w/e 04/11/1951
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 25/12/1954
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 28A Motherwell m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 63A Perth South m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 04/11/1951
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/12/1954
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 200
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40200    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
04/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40200    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev