Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 852 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1926 Week
» 27287 Month
» 260207 Year
» 1925583 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 202 on 14/02/1938
British Railways 40202 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 14/02/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/02/1938
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke 4w/e 12/07/1952
5D   Stoke 4w/e 12/07/1952
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/08/1953
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 26/01/1957
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 10/08/1957
9A   Longsight 4w/e 25/01/1958
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 22/03/1958
8D   Widnes w/e 19/03/1960
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/05/1960
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 15/07/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 10/08/1957
LOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 25/01/1958
EXLOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 22/03/1958
LOAN 8D Widnes 4w/e 26/03/1960
EXLOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/02/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 202
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40202    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
19/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40202    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev