Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 277 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5677 Week
» 23729 Month
» 256649 Year
» 1922025 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 203 on 21/02/1938
British Railways 40203 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 21/02/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 24 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 23/02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/02/1938
2E   Warwick on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 07/10/1950
14B   Kentish Town w/e 26/09/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8E Brunswick w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 3w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/10/1945 Market Harborough Station On 19/10, 3151 2A was yard shunter, 22911 2A was banking goods trains up to Oxenden, and 203 2A was working on the Melton Mowbray branch. All these locos are sub-shedded at Market Harborough.8273 17C was on an up empty stock train. 8338 stalled on the bank up to Desborough, about mile from the station. The 2.35 p.m. semi-fast from Leicester was behind it, hauled by 5685 14B, which was standing in the station. 5685 was uncoupled and went to assist 8338 in the rear. After banking it for a short distance, 5685 returned to its train, which was delayed for, about 30 minutes. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/02/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 203
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40203    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40203    
23/02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev