Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 206 on 18/03/1938
British Railways 40206 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 18/03/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/02/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/03/1938
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 8w/e 29/11/1952
3D   Aston 8w/e 11/07/1953
1A   Willesden w/e 17/12/1960
21D   Aston w/e 31/12/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 25/02/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 3D Aston 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 04/03/1961
WDN   w/e 24/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 206
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40206    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
17/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40206    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev