Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 207 on 21/04/1938
British Railways 40207 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 21/04/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/02/1962
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/04/1938
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8D   Widnes w/e 05/06/1948
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 18/03/1950
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 14/10/1950
7A   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/11/1950
3B   Bushbury 4w/e 09/08/1952
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 24/03/1956
1A   Willesden w/e 18/03/1961
2B   Nuneaton w/e 08/04/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 10/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 23/08/1947
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 30/08/1947
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 05/06/1948
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 10/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 207
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40207    
18/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
14/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
18/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
10/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40207    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev