Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 38 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4953 Week
» 16190 Month
» 249110 Year
» 1914486 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 208 on 22/04/1938
British Railways 40208 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 22/04/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/04/1938
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 21/10/1950
7A   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/11/1950
1A   Willesden m/e 16/06/1956
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 03/11/1956
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 03/11/1956
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 208
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40208    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40208    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev