Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 886 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1960 Week
» 27321 Month
» 260241 Year
» 1925617 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 209 on 21/04/1938
British Railways 40209 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 21/04/1938
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/04/1938
7A   Llandudno Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 29/05/1948
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 14/10/1950
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 04/11/1950
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 22/11/1947
LOAN 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 14/10/1950
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/04/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 209
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40209    
14/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40209    
05/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev