Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16001 Week
» 69017 Month
» 188544 Year
» 3215397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41215 |
on |
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 11/09/1948 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/01/1965 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1959 |
Chester Northgate MPD |
Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. |
SLS/196003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41215 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
23/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41215 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|