|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 41224 Built at Crewe Works |
||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) | ||
26/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
21/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Watford (1C) | ||
24/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (14E) | ||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
05/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
24/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) | ||
04/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
20/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) | ||
09/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 41224 | ||
12/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |