Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 950 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2024 Week
» 27385 Month
» 260305 Year
» 1925681 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41227 on 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 30/10/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/09/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/10/1948
2A   Rugby w/e 15/11/1958
84D   Leamington 4w/e 29/11/1958
91W   To Western Region / GWR w/e 29/08/1959
2A   Rugby w/e 26/09/1959
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 06/08/1960
16D   Annesley w/e 14/10/1961
15A   Wellingborough w/e 24/03/1962
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 04/05/1963
15B   Wellingborough w/e 28/09/1963
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964
15B   Wellingborough 4w/e 27/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 27/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 2E Warwick w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/12/1958
EXLOAN 2A Rugby 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 16D Annesley 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964
LOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 02/05/1964
EXLOAN 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 27/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1958 Leamington Spa - Weedon Leamington Spa - Weedon branch last day, 13th September. 41227(2C) worked the 2-30 p.m. ex Weedon (from bay platform), 41228 (2C) the 2-57 p.m. ex-Leamington (the last through up train) and returned with the 6-14 p.m. ex-Northampton as last down train and 41218(2E) worked the 6-30 p.m. ex-Leamington to Napton returning empty stock in front of last train. SLS/195810
17/11/1958 Shed Closures Coventry, Hunstanton and Warwick sheds closed w.e.f. 17th, 3rd and 17th November respectively. Of the Warwick locos. 41227/8/85, 42566 an 48018 have been transferred to Leamington (GW) 84D. SLS/195812
27/12/1958 Warwick MPD Further to a recent note, 41227/8/85 an 42566 were officially transferred to W.R. 13th December, 1958, but on 20th December 42566 was transferred back to Rugby and its daily parcels turn was worked (from 22nd December) by 82031 (84G) until 9th January when Fowler 2-6-4T 42388 (87K-Swansea) appeared on this duty. SLS/195902
13/06/1959 Last trains The locomotives on last trains on 13th June were as follows - 46496 (Cambridge-Kettering), 46467 ( Kettering-Cambridge), 41227 (Rugby-Leamington)), 41285 (Leamington- Rugby), 58065 (Southwell, then light engine to Lincoln), 84007 (Higham Ferrers). SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41227
Built at Crewe Works
   
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
14/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
27/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
27/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
27/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41227    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev