Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 994 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2068 Week
» 27429 Month
» 260349 Year
» 1925725 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41231 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1949
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/05/1964
Service Life 14 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1949
7D   Rhyl w/e 27/08/1949
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 08/10/1955
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 11/08/1956
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
84H   Wellington 4w/e 26/03/1960
84D   Leamington 4w/e 07/10/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 09/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 06/08/1949
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 09/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/08/1949 Crewe Works (North Shed) 21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' SLS/194909
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41231
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
09/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41231    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev